judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-3636
B-3636
10/17/1972
Application for Writ of Error
CLAYTON E. BLAKEWAY, ET AL.
SOUTHERN NATIONAL BANK
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/02/1973Response to Reply filedRespondent
03/26/1973Reply to ResponsePetitioner
02/08/1973Motion for RehearingPetitioner
11/24/1972Response to PetitionRespondent
10/17/1972Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/06/1973Letter Filed
04/02/1973Response to Reply filed
03/26/1973Reply to Response
02/14/1973Response to Motion filed
02/08/1973Motion for RehearingOverruled
11/24/1972Response to Petition
11/06/1972Motion for Extension of Time to File ResponseFiling granted
10/17/1972Application for Writ of Error - Filed
10/17/1972Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
SOUTHERN NATIONAL BANKRespondent
Clayton E. Blakeway, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information