Case: 22-1137
22-1137
12/16/2022
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
IN RE JEFF YOUNGER
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
12/30/2022 | Response to Brief filed | Real Parties in Interest | Response to Amicus Letters filed on behalf of Anne Georgulas. | |||||
12/29/2022 | Amicus Curiae Letter Received | Received (instead of filed) | Amicus Letter received from Texas Values. Submitted by Jonathan M. Saenz. |
| ||||
12/22/2022 | Amicus Curiae Letter Received | Amicus Curiae | Amicus Curiae Letter received on behalf of the State of Texas, submitted by Judd E. Stone, Office of the Attorney General, Austin, TX. | |||||
12/22/2022 | Amended Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed | Relator | Amended Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Jeff Younger. Not posted to website because extensive redaction necessary. | | ||||
12/16/2022 | Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed | Relator | Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Jeff Younger. Motion for Stay incorporated within Mandamus. |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
02/03/2023 | Case Stored | e-stored | | |||||
12/30/2022 | Justice(s) concurring in the denial of petition | Justice Blacklock filed an opinion concurring in the denial of the petition for writ of mandamus, in which Justice Young joined. (12/30/2022 4:37:45 PM) 221137c.pdf | ||||||
12/30/2022 | Response to Brief filed | Response to Amicus Letters filed on behalf of Anne Georgulas. | ||||||
12/30/2022 | Motion to file document(s) sealed by the Court disposed. | Filing granted in part | Motion to Seal Court Records is granted in part. | | ||||
12/30/2022 | Motion to Stay Disposed | Denied | Amended Emergency Motion for Stay is denied. | | ||||
12/30/2022 | Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposed | Case denied with opinion | Justice Blacklock filed an opinion concurring in the denial of the petition for writ of mandamus, in which Justice Young joined. (12/30/2022 4:37:45 PM) 221137c.pdf |
| ||||
12/29/2022 | Amicus Curiae Letter Received | Amicus Letter received from Texas Values. Submitted by Jonathan M. Saenz. |
| |||||
12/28/2022 | Call received | Call received from relator. | | |||||
12/28/2022 | Miscellaneous Motion | Motion to Require Aliases, Redact Sensitive Information, Restrict Remote Access, and Not Post Case to Internet, or in the Alternative, Motion to Seal Court Records filed on behalf of Anne Georgulas. | ||||||
12/28/2022 | Response to Motion filed | Response to Motion to Stay filed on behalf of Anne Georgulas. | ||||||
12/23/2022 | Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response | Requested response to the motion to stay due no later than 12 p.m., Wednesday, December 28, 2022. |
| |||||
12/22/2022 | Amicus Curiae Letter Received | Amicus Curiae Letter received on behalf of the State of Texas, submitted by Judd E. Stone, Office of the Attorney General, Austin, TX. | ||||||
12/22/2022 | Amended Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed | Amended Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Jeff Younger. Not posted to website because extensive redaction necessary. | | |||||
12/21/2022 | Amendment to Motion filed | Amended Motion to Stay filed on behalf of Jeff Younger. | | |||||
12/16/2022 | Call received | Call from Relator informing Court of Emergency Mandamus. | | |||||
12/16/2022 | Motion to Stay Filed | Motion for Emergency Stay filed on behalf of Jeff Younger. Motion for Stay incorporated into Mandamus. | | |||||
12/16/2022 | Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed | Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Jeff Younger. Motion for Stay incorporated within Mandamus. |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
02/03/2023 | Case Stored | Case stored. | e-stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Younger, Jeffrey Damon | Relator | Mr. Jeffery D. Gooch Jeffrey Damon Younger |
Georgulas, Anne | Real Party in Interest | Ms. Lauren Shaw Ms. Jessica Hall Janicek Mr. Paul M. Leopold |
Texas Values | Amicus Curiae | Mr. Jonathan M. Saenz |
The State of Texas | Amicus Curiae | Mr. Judd E. Stone II |
JA.D.Y and JU.D.Y., children | Other interested party | Mr. Stacy Arnold Dunlop |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information
301st District Court
Dallas
Honorable Mary Catherine Brown
DF-15-09887