judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Basim Mousilli v. Noura Sweed

Case: 14-22-00139-CV
14-22-00139-CV
03/01/2022
Divorce
Basim Mousilli
Noura Sweed
No
www.txcourts.gov/14thcoa
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Document
No briefs.
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Document
02/07/2023Case stored
02/07/2023Mandate issued
02/07/2023Motion disposedGRANTED
02/07/2023Judgment Issued
02/07/2023Memorandum opinion issuedREVERSED AND REMANDED
02/07/2023Mandate due to be issued
02/06/2023Case ready to be set
02/06/2023Submitted
12/13/2022Motion filed
12/13/2022Response due
11/30/2022Letter filed
11/22/2022Order entered
11/17/2022Appellants brief due
11/15/2022Letter filed
10/27/2022Case reinstated
10/27/2022Order entered
08/24/2022Response due
08/02/2022Motion disposedGRANTED
07/25/2022Response due
07/12/2022Motion to abate appeal filed
04/26/2022Order issuedABATED
04/26/2022Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
04/18/2022Response due
04/14/2022Reporters record due
04/13/2022Response due
04/12/2022Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
04/01/2022No payment arrangements made with court reporter for record
04/01/2022Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record
03/31/2022Notice of late record
03/31/2022Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record
03/30/2022Notice of late record
03/30/2022Clerks record filed
03/29/2022No payment arrangements made with trial court clerk for record
03/29/2022Order entered
03/29/2022Motion to consolidate disposedGRANTED
03/29/2022Motion for extension of time to file notice of appeal disposedDENIED
03/29/2022Motion for extension of time to file notice of appeal disposedGRANTED
03/28/2022Record due
03/16/2022Docketing statement filed
03/16/2022Mediation docketing statement due
03/16/2022Docketing statement due
03/11/2022Court fee due
03/09/2022Motion to consolidate filed
03/08/2022Motion for extension of time to file notice of appeal filed
03/08/2022Fee paid
03/07/2022Motion for extension of time to file notice of appeal filed
03/01/2022Letter issued by the court
03/01/2022Letter issued by the court
03/01/2022Case began in court of appeals
02/28/2022Notice of appeal filed in trial court
01/25/2022Judgment signed by trial court judge
12/15/2021Judgment signed by trial court judge
11/12/2021Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court
11/02/2021Request for findings of fact and conclusions of law
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/07/2023Case StoredCase stored
02/07/2029RetentionDate civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Sweed, NouraAppelleeDouglas Ray York
Mousilli, BasimAppellantElizabeth Michele Revere
Lema Barazi
Feras Mousilli
Trial Court Information
309th District Court
Harris
Honorable Judge, 309th District Court
2020-49635
Mekailah McChriston