Case: 10-22-00282-CV
10-22-00282-CV
08/25/2022
Plea to jurisdiction
Dr. Leonard Bright
Texas A&M University
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/01/2023 | Reply brief filed | Appellant |
| ||||
02/09/2023 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellee |
| ||||
10/26/2022 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/01/2023 | Reply brief filed |
| |||||
02/09/2023 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
02/09/2023 | Brief filed - oral argument requested |
| |||||
02/09/2023 | Motion to strike filed |
| |||||
01/06/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Grant motion |
| ||||
01/06/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
11/28/2022 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Grant motion |
| ||||
11/22/2022 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
10/26/2022 | Brief filed - oral argument requested |
| |||||
09/28/2022 | Reporters record filed |
| |||||
09/16/2022 | Docketing statement filed |
| |||||
09/08/2022 | Appearance of counsel |
| |||||
08/31/2022 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||
08/31/2022 | Fee paid | | |||||
08/25/2022 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
| |||||
08/05/2022 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/09/2023 | At Issue | At issue |
02/09/2023 | Motion | Motion to strike |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Bright, Leonard | Appellant | Gregg M. Rosenberg |
Texas A&M University | Appellee | Lisa McClain Mitchell Kelsey Hanson |
Trial Court Information
272nd District Court
Brazos
Honorable John L. Brick
20-000811-CV-272
Kaetheryne B. Kyriell