judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN RE: ESTATE OF BLITSTEIN

Case Information: 33413
Short Caption:IN RE: ESTATE OF BLITSTEINCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - P35417Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:LeavittCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Justice Maupin for Justice LeavittPanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:12/22/1998 / Berkson, LesterSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/27/2001How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/02/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
12/02/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 98-00221
12/02/1998Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
12/02/1998Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
12/09/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Jones Vargas--check no. 0024200.
12/11/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on: 12/3/98. 98-00338
12/17/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 98-00416
12/22/1998Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lester H. Berkson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
01/04/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Leavitt. Sat in district court proceedings.
10/04/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 99-09492
10/29/1999Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 99-10611
11/15/1999Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 99-11226
02/25/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: UPS 2/24/00. 00-03003
02/25/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 00-03006
03/20/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file and serve the proof of service or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed against counsel for appellant. 00-04355
03/24/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. From Attorney Bryan A. Lowe for Opening Brief and Appendix. 00-04786
04/26/2000MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: May 24, 2000. 00-06748
05/30/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time to File Respondents' Answering Brief (Second Request). 00-09078
06/01/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. Respondents' answering brief shall be served and filed on or before June 8, 2000. 00-09203
06/12/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 6/8/00. 00-09839
06/12/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 00-09840
06/12/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Of Erratum to Respondent's Answering Brief. (Placed in file with briefs.) 00-09858
08/28/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted as of the date of this order, on the record and briefs filed herein. 00-15037
08/28/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
03/27/2001Case Status Update Resubmitted for Decision. Southern Nevada Panel: SNP01A-WM/CY/NB.
08/09/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP01A-WM/CY/NB. 01-13548
09/05/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-13579
09/05/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/26/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 18, 2001. 01-13579