judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FOXLEY & CO., a Delaware Corporation v. JOHN R. ELLIS and PATRICIA A. ELLIS

Case Heading (S-07-0256)
Case Number:S-07-0256Case Docketed On:11/02/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Carbon CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Property, Conveyances and Security Transactions (Title 34)
Short Title:FOXLEY & CO., a Delaware Corporation v. JOHN R. ELLIS and PATRICIA A. ELLIS
Full Title:FOXLEY & CO., a Delaware Corporation, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. JOHN R. ELLIS and PATRICIA A. ELLIS, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantFoxley & Co.Stephen H. Kline
AppelleeJohn R. EllisPaul J. Hickey
Roger Fransen
O'Kelley H. Pearson
AppelleePatricia A. EllisPaul J. Hickey
Roger Fransen
O'Kelley H. Pearson

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Contracts, Property - Real
Opinion Number:2009 WY 16
Citation:201 P.3d 425

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/02/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/02/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
11/02/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
11/02/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/17/2007Brief - Appellant; and received copy of brief on disk.BriefAppellantFinal
02/04/2008Brief - Appellees John R. Ellis and Patricia A. Ellis; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
02/04/2008Notice-Incoming - Statement of costs - AppelleesNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
02/20/2008Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
02/21/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
02/25/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
02/26/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/26/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal, seven volumes. Volumes I-III, original papers; Volume IV, depositions; Volumes V- VI, original papers; Volume VII, transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
02/26/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
02/29/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Paul Hickey for appellees.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/10/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Stephen Kline for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/13/2008Motion - Expedite - Request for submission of matter upon the briefs without oral argument.MotionBrief onlyFinal
03/14/2008Order - Vacating oral argument and assigning to expedited docketOrderVacating oral argument and assigning to brief only docketFinal
02/11/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing in part. Justice Golden writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
02/27/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
02/27/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
02/27/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
02/27/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/04/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 3/3/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal