Case: 04-23-00554-CR
04-23-00554-CR
05/30/2023
Sexual Assault
Frank Velasquez, Jr.
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
11/14/2023 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | State |
| ||
10/13/2023 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/06/2024 | Submitted | | |||||
02/01/2024 | Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied | | |||||
11/15/2023 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
11/14/2023 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||
10/27/2023 | Order entered |
| |||||
10/27/2023 | Motion disposed | Grant motion | | ||||
10/19/2023 | Motion filed |
| |||||
10/13/2023 | Letter filed |
| |||||
10/13/2023 | Brief filed - oral argument requested |
| |||||
10/06/2023 | Order entered |
| |||||
10/06/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Grant motion | | ||||
09/29/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
09/18/2023 | Order entered |
| |||||
09/18/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Grant motion | | ||||
08/28/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
08/28/2023 | Order entered |
| |||||
07/13/2023 | Reporters record filed |
| |||||
07/11/2023 | Reporters record filed |
| |||||
07/10/2023 | Reporters record filed |
| |||||
06/15/2023 | Prescreened | | |||||
06/13/2023 | No reporters record filed in criminal case |
| |||||
06/07/2023 | Docketing statement filed |
| |||||
06/05/2023 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||
05/30/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
| |||||
05/26/2023 | Case began in court of appeals | | |||||
02/10/2023 | Sentence imposed in the trial court | | |||||
02/07/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/06/2024 | Submitted | Submitted on briefs |
05/30/2023 | Status | Pending action of court |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Roberto Serna Dorian Claude Cotlar |
Velasquez, Jr., Frank | Criminal - Appellant | Clay Dean Thomas |
Trial Court Information
293rd Judicial District Court
Maverick
Honorable Elma T. Salinas-Ender
19-04-08008-MCR
Maria Gallegos