Case: 05-23-01102-CV
05-23-01102-CV
11/02/2023
Mandamus
In Re: Eliza Jasso Garcia
Yes
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
11/02/2023 | Petition for writ of mandamus filed | Relator |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/02/2024 | Sent to publisher | | |||||
11/17/2023 | Memorandum opinion issued | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
11/17/2023 | Order entered | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
11/17/2023 | Retention time case file will be retained | Destroy | | ||||
11/13/2023 | Letter filed | | |||||
11/13/2023 | Letter filed | | |||||
11/13/2023 | Response due | | |||||
11/03/2023 | Order entered | Otherwise Disposed |
| ||||
11/03/2023 | Submitted | | |||||
11/02/2023 | Petition for writ of mandamus filed |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
11/17/2023 | Case Stored | Case stored |
11/17/2029 | Retention | Date civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate) |
12/17/2023 | Original Proceedings | Response due |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Garcia, David | Real party in interest | Danyale K. Holland |
Garcia, Eliza Jasso | Relator | Vincent Ndukwe |
Trial Court Information
302nd Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Sandra L. Jackson
DF-22-03471
Melva Key