judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-3611
B-3611
10/05/1972
Application for Writ of Error
HERMAN MARCUS
MERCHANDISE MART, INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/15/1973Motion for RehearingPetitioner
10/27/1972Response to PetitionRespondent
10/05/1972Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/25/1973Letter Filed
03/21/1973Response to Motion filed
03/15/1973Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/27/1972Response to Petition
10/05/1972Application for Writ of Error - Filed
10/05/1972Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Merchandise Mart, Inc.Respondent
Herman MarcusPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information