judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-2053
A-2053
01/27/1949
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
R. E. SMITH
HON. RUBEN A. HALL, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/04/1949Motion for RehearingRespondent
03/05/1949Response to Brief filedRelator
03/03/1949Brief on the MeritsRespondent
02/18/1949Brief on the MeritsRelator
02/02/1949Petition for Writ of Mandamus filedRelator
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/04/1949Motion for Rehearing
03/05/1949Response to Brief filed
03/03/1949Brief on the Merits
02/18/1949Brief on the Merits
02/02/1949Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed
01/27/1949Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamus
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Hon. Ruben A. Hall, et al.Respondent
R. E. SmithRelator
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information