judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-2105
A-2105
02/02/1949
Application for Writ of Error
BERTIE LORENE GREATHOUSE, ET AL.
TEXAS PUBLIC UTILITIES CORPORATION
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/18/1949Reply to ResponsePetitioner
04/06/1949Motion for RehearingPetitioner
02/02/1949Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/18/1949Reply to Response
04/11/1949Response to Motion filed
04/06/1949Motion for Rehearing
02/22/1949Document received (See Remarks)
02/02/1949Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas Public Utilities CorporationRespondent
Bertie Lorene Greathouse, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information