Case: 05-21-00024-CV
05-21-00024-CV
01/12/2021
Contract
Tahl Benit
Primalend Capital Partners, LP.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/25/2021 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
04/24/2021 | Appellees brief due | | |||||
04/23/2021 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
04/06/2021 | Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed |
| |||||
03/26/2021 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
03/25/2021 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||
02/24/2021 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
02/22/2021 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
02/12/2021 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
02/07/2021 | Record due | | |||||
01/25/2021 | Electronic Clerks Record Filed |
| |||||
01/21/2021 | Fee paid |
| |||||
01/21/2021 | Docketing statement filed | ||||||
01/12/2021 | Fee requested |
| |||||
01/12/2021 | Docketing statement due |
| |||||
01/12/2021 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
| |||||
01/07/2021 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
12/09/2020 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/24/2021 | Motion | Extension of time to file appellees brief |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Primalend Capital Partners, LP. | Appellee | Nicholas D. Stepp Sabrina A. Neff |
Benit, Tahl | Appellant | Brian Patrick Shaw |
Trial Court Information
95th District Court
Dallas
Honorable Dallas District Judge, 95th District Court
DC-19-16217
Deana K. Rouse