judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-92
B-92
02/06/1967
Application for Writ of Error
FIRST SAVNGS AND LOAN ASSOCIATION, CRAVER-HICKS BUILDING MAINTENANCE, INC.
W. H. VANLANDINGHAM, ET UX.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/10/1967Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/06/1967Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
02/23/1967Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
02/21/1967Response to PetitionRespondent
02/06/1967Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
02/06/1967Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/10/1967Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/29/1967Letter Filed
03/06/1967Amicus Curiae Brief received
02/23/1967Supplemental Brief filed
02/21/1967Response to Petition
02/06/1967Application for Writ of Error - Filed
02/06/1967Application for Writ of Error - Filed
02/06/1967Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Craver-Hicks Building Maintenance, Inc.Petitioner
L. Wayne ScottAmicus Curiae
W. H. Vanlandingham, et ux.Respondent
First Savngs and Loan AssociationPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information