judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KEVIN D. ULMER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 92-CF-1415
Short Caption:KEVIN D. ULMER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F5060-90Filed Date:11/13/1992

Opening Event Date:11/13/1992Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/02/1993Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/29/1994
Argued/Submitted:06/20/1994
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/07/1995
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantKevin D. Ulmer Y
James W. KleinNY
Omodare Jupiter YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN
Chrisellen R. KolbYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/13/1992NOTICE OF APPEAL
12/02/1992ORDER APPOINTING James Klein, Esq. as counsel for appellant. Docketing statement due in 10 days. (Rogers)
12/04/1992APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT
12/04/1992STATEMENT regarding the transcript.
12/23/1992RECORD ON APPEAL
12/23/1992SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (attached to record) 22 pgs/Rust - 10/28/92 proc.
02/05/1993SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (796 pgs. - Jones) (7/27 - 8/4/92 proc.)
03/31/1993ORDER: The brief of appellant shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order and the brief of appellee shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. Any requests for an extension of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only in extraordinary circumstances. (By WHN)
04/06/1993APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until rt's are complete
06/16/1993ORD GRANT APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEFand the brief of appellant shall be filed within 40 days from the date the transcript is filed with this court. (by WHN)
10/05/1993SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (54 pages--Robinson) (8/3/92 proceedings)
11/02/1993RECORD COMPLETED
11/02/1993SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (300 pages--Robinson) (7/23,24/92 proceedings)
11/22/1993ORDER that the brief of appellant shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and the brief of appellee shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. Any request for an extension of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (by: WHN)
12/09/1993STATEMENT- supplemental statement regarding the transcipt
01/03/1994APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until February 3, 1994.
01/12/1994SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (21 pgs. - Jones) (7/27/92 proc.)
01/13/1994ORDER: Grant the motion of appellant for an extension of time within which to file his brief and the brief of appellant shall be filed on or before February 3, 1994__. Any further request for an extension of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only in extraordinary circumstances. (By WHN)
02/03/1994APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until February 17, 1994. (no oppo)
02/15/1994ORD GRANT APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF on or before February 17, 1994. Any further request for an extension of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (by: WHN)
02/22/1994APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF
02/22/1994RECEIVED appellant's brief.
02/28/1994ORDER GRANTING APLT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF and the lodged brief is filed. F/O that the brief of appellee shall be filed on or before March 29, 1994. (by: WHN)
02/28/1994APPELLANT'S BRIEF
03/29/1994APPELLEE'S BRIEF
03/29/1994BRIEFS COMPLETED
03/30/1994APLE MOTION FOR LV TO FILE AMENDED/CORRECTED BRIEF
03/30/1994RECEIVED - aple's brief (Corrected copy)
04/07/1994ORD GRT APLE MO FOR LV TO FL AMENDED/CORRECTED BRF and the lodged corrected brief is filed. (by:WHN)
04/07/1994APPELLEE'S AMENDED/CORRECTED BRIEF
04/11/1994FINAL SCREENING - REGULAR CALENDAR
06/20/1994FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/20/1994ARGUED (WG,FE,KE) Omodare Jupiter, Esquire, for appellant. Chirsellen R. Kolb, Esquire, for appellee.
06/23/1994APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION - for leave to file statement concerning record
06/23/1994RECEIVED - aplt's statement concerning transcript
07/13/1994ORDER - Grant aplt's motion for leave to file appellant's statement concerning the record, and the lodged statement, and there appearing to be no opposition thereto, and the lodged statement is filed. WAGEKN
10/27/1994VACATED IN PART/AFFIRMED IN PART/REMANDED IN PART OPinion
11/10/1994APLT'S PETITION FOR REHEARING/REHEARING EN BANC
05/16/1995ORD DENY APPELLANT'S PETITION FOR REH/REH EN BANC (EB)
06/07/1995MANDATE ISSUED