judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-109
B-109
02/03/1967
Application for Writ of Error
BROOKE GAS CORPORATION
SINCLAIR OIL AND GAS COMPANY, SKELLY OIL COMPANY, SINCLAIR OIL AND GAS COMPANY AND SKELLY OIL COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/04/1967Response to Reply filedRespondent
04/18/1967Reply to ResponsePetitioner
04/03/1967Response to PetitionRespondent
03/22/1967Brief in Support of PetitionRespondent
03/16/1967Response to PetitionRespondent
02/14/1967Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/04/1967Response to Reply filed
04/18/1967Reply to Response
04/04/1967Motion to amend application for writ of error
04/03/1967Response to Petition
04/03/1967Motion to dismiss
03/22/1967Brief in Support of Petition
03/22/1967Motion to dismissOverruled
03/16/1967Response to Petition
02/20/1967Motion for Extension of Time to File ResponseFiling granted
02/17/1967Motion for Extension of Time to File ResponseFiling granted
02/14/1967Application for Writ of Error - Filed
02/14/1967Document received (See Remarks)
02/03/1967Response to Motion filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Sinclair Oil and Gas CompanyRespondent
Sinclair Oil and Gas Company and Skelly Oil CompanyRespondent
Brooke Gas CorporationPetitioner
Skelly Oil CompanyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information