judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

EICON VS. MARKS

Case Information: 33376
Short Caption:EICON VS. MARKSCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A388543Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:11/25/1998 / Hale, FloydSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/20/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
11/20/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 98-00127
11/25/1998Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Floyd A. Hale. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
12/07/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 98-00286
01/08/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. February 8, 1999, at 10:00 a.m. - 425 S. 6th Street-Ste. 300-LV 99-00120
03/01/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. Returned unfiled with letter to attorney Javier a. Arguello: original and three copies of "Confidential Settlement Agreement". 99-01381
01/31/2000Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 00-01542
02/08/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties have agreed to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant has 30 days to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. 00-02018
03/24/2000Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 00-04744
04/13/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. NNP/CLK 00-05909
04/13/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.