judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SIIS VS. PERKINS

Case Information: 33377
Short Caption:SIIS VS. PERKINSCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A390020Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:11/25/1998 / Crockett, JamesSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/20/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
11/20/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 98-00128
11/25/1998Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: James R. Crockett, Jr . (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
12/09/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 98-00305
08/05/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 99-07208
09/14/1999Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with provisions of NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 99-08649
10/18/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, file and serve either a transcript request form or a certificate of no transcript request or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed against counsel for appellant. 99-10059
10/22/1999Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 99-10362
01/14/2000MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: February 9, 2000. 00-00672
02/10/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 2/10/99. 00-02150
02/10/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 and 2. 00-02151
03/31/2000Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from attorney Virginia Hunt. A stipulation to dismiss this appeal is forthcoming. 00-05224
04/27/2000Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. Stipulated Settlement. 00-06861
05/05/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." SNP/CLK 00-07342
05/05/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.