judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF WILMA FISHER, SURVIVING SPOUSE OF DAVID E. FISHER, AN EMPLOYEE OF THE WESTERN SUGAR COMPANY: WILMA FISHER v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION,

Case Heading (S-07-0220)
Case Number:S-07-0220Case Docketed On:09/19/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Big Horn CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF WILMA FISHER, SURVIVING SPOUSE OF DAVID E. FISHER, AN EMPLOYEE OF THE WESTERN SUGAR COMPANY: WILMA FISHER v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION,
Full Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF WILMA FISHER, SURVIVING SPOUSE OF DAVID E. FISHER, AN EMPLOYEE OF THE WESTERN SUGAR COMPANY: WILMA FISHER, Appellant (Petitioner/Claimant), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellee (Objector/Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantWilma FisherLarry B. Jones
AppelleeDepartment of Employment - Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionBruce A. Salzburg
John William Renneisen
Steven R. Czoschke
Kristi Marie Radosevich

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Workers' Compensation
Opinion Number:2008 WY 89
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/19/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/19/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/19/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
09/19/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/02/2007Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on disk; and received statement of costs.BriefAppellantFinal
12/12/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appelleeMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/13/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
01/03/2008Brief - Appellee; and received copy of brief on disk.BriefAppelleeFinal
01/03/2008Notice-Incoming - Designation of record from counsel for appelleeNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
01/11/2008Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
01/22/2008Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
01/23/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/24/2008Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
01/28/2008Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
01/28/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal, three volumes. Volumes I-II, original papers; Volume III, transcript.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/30/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/11/2008Motion - Fees and costs; affidavit and invoiceMotionFees and costsFinal
08/12/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for payment of fees and costs; and affidavit in support of award for attorney's fees and costsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/03/2008Order - Awarding attorney fees and costsOrderAwarding attorney fees and costsFinal
09/03/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/03/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
09/03/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/03/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/09/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal