judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-2069
A-2069
02/09/1949
Application for Writ of Error
H. ROBERT SMITH, ET AL.
ROBERT WHITE, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/17/1949Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/01/1949Reply to ResponsePetitioner
02/17/1949Response to PetitionRespondent
02/13/1949Errata FiledPetitioner
02/09/1949Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/26/1949Response to Motion filed
03/17/1949Motion for Rehearing
03/01/1949Reply to Response
02/17/1949Response to Petition
02/13/1949Errata Filed
02/09/1949Application for Writ of Error - Filed
02/09/1949Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Robert White, et al.Respondent
H. Robert Smith, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information