Case Information: 33391 | |||
Short Caption: | WHEELER VS. UPTON-WHEELER | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - DV9301293 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 02/26/1999 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
11/24/1998 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from John Wheeler--check no. 2881. | ||
11/24/1998 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 98-00170 | |
12/09/1998 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on: 12/03/98. | 98-00321 | |
01/26/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 30 days. [fn1]--The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court. | 99-00541 | |
02/26/1999 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal. Volumes 1 through 5. Mailed on: 2/24/99. | 99-01328 | |
02/26/1999 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
02/03/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Requesting briefing. Respondent shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file a brief. Respondent's brief must comply with the provisions of NRAP 28(b). fn1[Appellant has sought leave to proceed in proper person with respect to this appeal. We grant appellant leave to proceed in proper person only with respect to the opening brief, and we direct the clerk to file the brief, which was received on June 24, 1999. This order requesting briefing does not grant appellant leave to file a response to respondent's brief or to provide this court with any other supplemental documents concerning this appeal.] | 00-01733 | |
02/03/2000 | Brief | Filed Proper Person Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief. Hand delivered 06/23/99. | 99-05523 | |
03/03/2000 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 3/3/00 (Reno/Carson). | 00-03433 | |
03/03/2000 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief. | 00-03436 | |
04/26/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. Judgment: "We ORDER this appeal dismissed." - SNP99B-WM/MS/NB. | 00-06812 | |
05/23/2000 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. Returned Record on Appeal, Vols. 1 through 5. | 00-08599 | |
05/23/2000 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/07/2000 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 24, 2000. | 00-08599 |