judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

NEWPORT INTERNATIONAL UNIVERSITY, INC. v. STATE OF WYOMING, DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION and JAMES M. McBRIDE, in his official capacity as Superintendent of Public Instruction

Case Heading (S-07-0234)
Case Number:S-07-0234Case Docketed On:10/11/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Education (Title 21)
Short Title:NEWPORT INTERNATIONAL UNIVERSITY, INC. v. STATE OF WYOMING, DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION and JAMES M. McBRIDE, in his official capacity as Superintendent of Public Instruction
Full Title:NEWPORT INTERNATIONAL UNIVERSITY, INC., Appellant (Plaintiff) v. STATE OF WYOMING, DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION and JAMES M. McBRIDE, in his official capacity as Superintendent of Public Instruction, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantNewport International University, Inc.Galen Bruce Woelk
Steve C.M. Aron
AppelleeDepartment of EducationBruce A. Salzburg
Robin Sessions Cooley
AppelleeJames M. McBrideBruce A. Salzburg
Robin Sessions Cooley

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Constitutional Law - Wyoming, Contracts, Schools
Opinion Number:2008 WY 72
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/11/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/11/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/11/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
10/11/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/28/2007Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
01/14/2008Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
01/17/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
01/22/2008Notice-Internal - Recusal memo from Justice HillNotice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
01/25/2008Brief - Appellant reply; received copy of brief on diskBriefAppellant replyFinal
01/25/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/25/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgments - oral argument setting - Robin Cooley for appellees; Galen Woelk for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/01/2008Order - Assignment of judge - Judge Park for Justice Hill.OrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
02/04/2008Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
02/04/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal, two volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
02/04/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
03/03/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before Chief Justice Voigt, Justices Golden, Kite and Burke, and Park, District Judge (Galen Bruce Woelk for appellant; Robin Sessions Cooley, Deputy Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
03/03/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
06/25/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming; District Judge Park writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/11/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/11/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/11/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/11/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/15/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 7/14/08 by C. Roybal.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal