Case Information: 10-CO-1110 | |||
Short Caption: | MICHAEL SINDRAM V. UNITED STATES | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal Other - Other Criminal |
Lead: | 09-CM-1029 | Consolidated: | 10-CO-1110 |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | DVM971-09 | Filed Date: | 08/23/2010 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 08/23/2010 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 10/26/2010 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 01/10/2011 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 03/03/2011 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 06/16/2011 | ||
Costs Waived |
Party Information | |||||||||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||||||||
Appellant | Michael Sindram | Y |
| ||||||||||||
Appellee | United States | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
08/23/2010 | NOTICE OF APPEAL | |||
10/20/2010 | FURTHER ORDERED that WARREN GORMAN IS HEREBY APPOINTED to represent appellant in appeal no. 10CO1110. It is *****MORE***** | |||
10/20/2010 | FURTHER ORDERED, SS, that APPEAL NO. 09CM1029 and 10CO1110 ARE CONSOLIDATED for all purposes herein. It is *****MORE***** | |||
10/20/2010 | FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLANT shall, W/N 40 DAYS from the date of this order FILE A SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF addressing the issues raised in APPEAL NO. 10CO1110. The supplemental brief of appellee shal be filed 30 days thereafter. (GLPRTE) (jl) | |||
10/26/2010 | RECORD INDEX (10CO1110) | |||
10/26/2010 | RECORD COPIES (10CO1110) | |||
10/26/2010 | RECORD COMPLETED | |||
11/16/2010 | APPELLANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF/MEMORANDUM | |||
11/16/2010 | APPENDIX | |||
12/16/2010 | APLE MOTION TO EXT TIME TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFto 12/23/10 | |||
12/23/2010 | RECEIVED Appellee's Supplemental Brief (mexsb still pend). | |||
01/10/2011 | On consideration of the motion of appellee for an extension of time within which to file the supplemental brief, to which no opposition has been filed, and the lodged supplemental brief, it is ORDERED that the motion of appellee is granted and the lodged supplemental brief of appellee is filed. (By: JAC) | |||
01/10/2011 | APPELLEE'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF/MEMORANDUM | |||
01/10/2011 | BRIEFS COMPLETED | |||
01/19/2011 | APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF (no oppo) | |||
01/19/2011 | RECEIVED - aplt's supplemental reply brief | |||
02/01/2011 | On consideration of appellant's motion for leave to late file the lodged reply brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and the lodged reply brief is filed. (By: JAC) | |||
02/01/2011 | APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF | |||
02/02/2011 | CALENDAR NOTICE SENT | |||
03/03/2011 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
03/03/2011 | ARGUED before Chief Judge Washington, Thompson, Steadman Warren Gorman, Esq. for the APPELLANT Andrew Finkelman, Esq. for the APPELLEE | |||
03/25/2011 | AFFIRMED (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, Thompson, Associate Judge, and Steadman, Senior Judge.) | |||
04/08/2011 | APLT MO TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE PET FOR REHEARING for 30 days | |||
04/08/2011 | LETTER - courtsey copy of letter from appellant to counsel regarding request for rehearing | |||
04/12/2011 | ORD GRT APLT MO TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE PET FOR REH on or before May 12, 2011. (WH) | |||
04/26/2011 | APPELLANT'S PETITION FOR REHEARING EN BANC | |||
04/28/2011 | RECEIVED - letter from Sindram to attorney. courtsey copy to DCCA | |||
04/28/2011 | RECEIVED - from appellant Motion for Clarification and Modification of Order and for Related Relief Commensurate with Fed. R. Civ p. 65 (filed in the U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia, No. 11-213-UNA) | |||
05/23/2011 | ORDER DENYING APLT PETITION FOR REHEARING EN BANC (WHRZGLFIBRTHOBKR) (Judge Reid is recused from this case.) (Judge Reid was an Associate Judge of the court at time of argument. Her status changed to Associate Judge, Retired, on April 7, 2011. Judge Kramer was an Associate Judge of the court at time of argument. Her status changed to Associate Judge, Retired, on May 1, 2011.) | |||
06/16/2011 | MANDATE ISSUED | |||
09/14/2011 | Filed | Copy/Notice Of Petition For Writ Of Certiorari (Appellant) | ||
10/18/2011 | Filed | Notice Of Denial Of Pet. For Writ Of Certiorari (Appellant) |