judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MELTON (JAMES MICHAEL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 33392
Short Caption:MELTON (JAMES MICHAEL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C145890Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:04/28/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/25/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
11/25/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 98-00172
01/19/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. [fn1]--The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court. Nos. 31667, 33292, 33315, 33354, 33392, 33508, 33540, 33541, 33543, 33544. 99-00301
04/28/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Mailed on 4/26/99. 99-03355
04/28/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
09/24/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 99-09129
10/20/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 99-10228
10/20/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/08/1999RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 28, 1999. 99-10228