judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ORLAN O. GARWOOD and CAROL A. JONES as Trustees of the W.J. GARWOOD and MILDRED E. GARWOOD FAMILY TRUST v. WILLIAM J. GARWOOD, individually and JUDY K. KECHTER, as Trustee of the W.J. GARWOOD and MILDRED E. GARWOOD FAMILY TRUST

Case Heading (S-07-0235)
Case Number:S-07-0235Case Docketed On:10/12/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Platte CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Wills, Decedents' Estates and Probate Code (Title 2)
Short Title:ORLAN O. GARWOOD and CAROL A. JONES as Trustees of the W.J. GARWOOD and MILDRED E. GARWOOD FAMILY TRUST v. WILLIAM J. GARWOOD, individually and JUDY K. KECHTER, as Trustee of the W.J. GARWOOD and MILDRED E. GARWOOD FAMILY TRUST
Full Title:ORLAN O. GARWOOD and CAROL A. JONES as Trustees of the W.J. GARWOOD and MILDRED E. GARWOOD FAMILY TRUST, Appellants (Defendants), v. WILLIAM J. GARWOOD, individually, Appellee (Plaintiff), and JUDY K. KECHTER, as Trustee of the W.J. GARWOOD and MILDRED E. GARWOOD FAMILY TRUST, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantOrlan O. GarwoodScott W. Meier
AppellantCarol A. JonesScott W. Meier
AppelleeWilliam J. GarwoodFrank J. Jones
AppelleeJudy K. Kechter Pro Se

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Estates - Trusts, Other
Opinion Number:2008 WY 129
Citation:194 P.3d 319

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/12/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/12/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/12/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
10/12/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/26/2007Brief - Appellants; received copy of designation of record on appeal and brief on diskBriefAppellantFinal
11/27/2007Notice-Incoming - Statement of costs - amended (attached to Brief of Appellants filed 11/26/07)Notice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
01/04/2008Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellee William J. GarwoodMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/04/2008Order - Grant - extension of time (appellee Garwood)OrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
01/15/2008Brief - Failure to file - appellee (Kechter)BriefFailure to file - appelleeFinal
01/28/2008Brief - Appellee William J. GarwoodBriefAppelleeFinal
02/07/2008Brief - Appellants' reply; and received copy of brief on disk.BriefAppellant replyFinal
02/13/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
02/22/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal, three volumes. Volume I, original papers; volume II, transcripts; volume III, exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
02/25/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
02/26/2008Event - Phone Call - received call from secretary for Scott Meier indicating that he has left Hickey & Evans and joined Hathaway & Kunz. Requested change of address notification and instructed to change address with bar office.EventPhone CallFinal
02/27/2008Notice-Incoming - Change of address for Scott W. MeierNotice-IncomingChange of addressFinal
02/27/2008Event - Phone Call to counsel for appellant re change of address. Co-Counsel will be filing notice of withdrawalEventPhone CallFinal
02/28/2008Motion - Withdrawal of counselMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
02/29/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Frank Jones for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/29/2008Order - Granting withdrawal of counsel - Howard V. Scotland IIIOrderGranting withdrawal of counselFinal
03/03/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Scott W. Meier for appellants.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/27/2008Motion - Oral argument - vacateMotionOral argument - vacateFinal
03/28/2008Order - Vacating setting for oral argumentOrderVacating setting for oral argumentFinal
04/02/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
04/07/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Scott W. Meier for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/13/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Scott W. Meier for appellants; Frank J. Jones for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
05/13/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
10/22/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
11/07/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
11/07/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
11/07/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
11/07/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
11/14/2008Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal