Case Information: 10-CO-1111 | |||
Short Caption: | MELVIN V. GIVENS V. UNITED STATES | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal Other - Den. Of Post-Conviction Relief |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | FEL497-03 | Filed Date: | 08/30/2010 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 08/30/2010 | Case Status: | Decided/Dismissed |
Record Completed: | 09/21/2010 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 02/10/2011 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 09/08/2011 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 10/07/2011 | ||
Costs Waived |
Party Information | |||||||||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||||||||
Appellant | Melvin V. Givens | Y | Pro Se | N | |||||||||||
Appellee | United States | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
08/30/2010 | NOTICE OF APPEAL | |||
09/15/2010 | On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on August 30, 2010, and it appearing that appellant was found eligible for cost-waived status in the trial court, and it further appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (By: JAC) | |||
09/21/2010 | RECORD INDEX | |||
09/21/2010 | RECORD COPIES | |||
09/21/2010 | RECORD COMPLETED | |||
09/23/2010 | It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo) | |||
11/04/2010 | APPELLANT'S BRIEF(RECVD in the USCA on 10/29/10). (no appendix) | |||
11/29/2010 | It appearing that the brief of appellant, was filed with this court on November 4, 2010, andit further appearing that the limited appendix has not been filed, (See D.C. App. R. 30, 31.), it is ORDERED that appellant shall within 15 days from the date of this order submit the limited appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the appendix or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days from the date the appendix is filed with this court. (By: JAC) | |||
12/21/2010 | ORDER: This appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (By: ETW) | |||
12/21/2010 | DISMISSED | |||
12/23/2010 | RECEIVED Appellant's Amended Brief,Appendix and Motion for Leave (received in the US Court of Appeals on 12/15/10) | |||
01/11/2011 | ORDERED: Sua sponte, that this appeal is hereby reinstated. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the Clerk shall file the lodged amended brief and limited appendix. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the brief of appellee shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. (By: ETW) | |||
01/11/2011 | APPELLANT'S BRIEF/appendix | |||
02/10/2011 | APPELLEE'S BRIEF | |||
02/10/2011 | BRIEFS COMPLETED | |||
02/25/2011 | Filed | Final Screening - Summary | ||
03/18/2011 | APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF to 30 days. | |||
04/11/2011 | On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the reply brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and appellant's reply brief shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. (By: JAC) | |||
06/28/2011 | APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF | |||
06/28/2011 | RECEIVED Appellant's Sur-Reply Brief. | |||
07/22/2011 | Filed | Order Granting appellant's motion For Leave to file the reply brief | ||
07/22/2011 | Filed | Reply Brief (Appellant) | ||
07/28/2011 | Filed | ACTION - Calendar notice sent | ||
08/11/2011 | Filed | Motion To Appoint Counsel (Appellant) | ||
09/06/2011 | Filed | Order Denying pro se aplt's motion to present argument | ||
09/08/2011 | Filed | Submitted to Judges Glickman, Oberly, Schwelb | ||
09/14/2011 | Filed | Affirmed (MOJ) (Glickman, Oberly and Schwelb) | ||
10/07/2011 | Filed | Mandate | ||
10/18/2011 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File Petition for Rehearing and/or Rehearing En Banc for 30 days. (Appellant) | ||
10/25/2011 | Filed | GRANT - Order Granting MOET to file appellant's petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc on or before November 18, 2011. | ||
12/28/2011 | Lodged | Petition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Appellant) | ||
02/22/2012 | Filed | Order Denying appellant's pro se petition for reh/reh en banc |