Case Information: 94-CV-0428 | |||
Short Caption: | YVONNE YOUNG V. DWIGHT HAYES ET. AL. | Classification: | Appeals - Civil - Other Civil |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | CA1436-94 | Filed Date: | 04/08/1994 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 04/08/1994 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | ||
Briefs Completed: | |||
Argued/Submitted: | |||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 07/18/1994 | ||
Costs Waived |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | Yvonne Young | Y | Pro Se | N | |||||
Appellee | Dwight Hayes | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | University of the District of Columbia | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | Gail Norris Hayes | N | Pro Se | N | |||||
Appellee | First Mortgage Financial Group | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | Lynn Lyle | N | Pro Se | N | |||||
Appellee | International Business Machines (Ibm) | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | Lynn M. Lyle | N | Pro Se | N |
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
04/08/1994 | NOTICE OF APPEAL | |||
04/22/1994 | APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS. | |||
04/22/1994 | RECEIVED - APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT. | |||
04/22/1994 | MOTION(S) FEE PAID | |||
05/11/1994 | APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL | |||
06/21/1994 | RECORD ON APPEAL | |||
06/23/1994 | ORDER GRANT APLT MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL, and this appeal is hereby dismissed. (More) | |||
06/23/1994 | ORDER DENYING APLT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS as moot. (By: AMW) | |||
06/23/1994 | DISMISSED | |||
07/18/1994 | MANDATE ISSUED |