Case: 08-93-00143-CR
08-93-00143-CR
05/14/1993
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Denney, Patrick McCoy
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
03/01/1996 | Mandate Issued | | |
03/01/1996 | Shuck purged | | |
03/01/1996 | Mandate Issued | | |
01/10/1996 | Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Overruled | |
12/18/1995 | Motion for Rehearing Filed | | |
12/13/1995 | Motion - extend time to file a MFR - Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
11/16/1995 | Motion - extend time to file MFR - Filed | | |
11/02/1995 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
11/02/1995 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
01/18/1995 | Submitted | | |
01/18/1995 | Submission | | |
01/18/1995 | Submitted | | |
12/15/1994 | Submission | | |
09/14/1994 | Brief Filed | | |
09/14/1994 | Case ready to be set | | |
09/14/1994 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
09/14/1994 | Case ready to be set | | |
08/29/1994 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |
08/17/1994 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
08/05/1994 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |
07/13/1994 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
06/28/1994 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |
06/08/1994 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
06/01/1994 | Miscellaneous Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
06/01/1994 | Supplemental Transcript Filed | | |
05/25/1994 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |
05/17/1994 | Miscellaneous Motion Filed | | |
04/28/1994 | Brief Filed | | |
04/28/1994 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
04/15/1994 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |
03/30/1994 | Miscellaneous Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
03/30/1994 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
03/30/1994 | Motion to supplement disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
03/30/1994 | Order entered | | |
03/30/1994 | Order entered | | |
03/30/1994 | Sup. St. of Facts Filed | | |
03/29/1994 | Response to Petition, Motion or Inquiry | | |
03/14/1994 | Miscellaneous Motion Filed | | |
03/14/1994 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |
03/14/1994 | Motion to supplement filed | | |
03/09/1994 | Miscellaneous Letter of Inquiry | | |
02/09/1994 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
02/09/1994 | Motion for leave to file disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
02/09/1994 | Order entered | | |
02/09/1994 | Order entered | | |
01/28/1994 | Amended Motion Filed to Correct Original Motion | | |
01/27/1994 | Miscellaneous Letter of Inquiry | | |
01/27/1994 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |
01/27/1994 | Motion for leave to * filed | | |
12/29/1993 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
12/29/1993 | Order entered | | |
12/17/1993 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |
12/01/1993 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
12/01/1993 | Motion to supplement disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
12/01/1993 | Sup. St. of Facts Filed | | |
11/19/1993 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |
11/19/1993 | Motion to supplement filed | | |
11/18/1993 | Miscellaneous Letter of Inquiry | | |
11/12/1993 | Miscellaneous Letter of Inquiry | | |
11/10/1993 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
10/28/1993 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |
09/29/1993 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
09/13/1993 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |
09/03/1993 | Miscellaneous Letter of Inquiry | | |
08/11/1993 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
07/28/1993 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |
06/28/1993 | Statement of Facts Filed | | |
06/28/1993 | Transcript Filed | | |
05/14/1993 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
05/14/1993 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/01/1996 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
DENNEY, PATRICK MCCOY | Criminal - Appellant | Hon. Jaime E. Gandara |
THE STATE OF TEXAS | Criminal - State of Texas | Hon. Jaime E. Esparza |
Trial Court Information
243rd District Court
El Paso
Honorable Herb Marsh
59562-243
Life