judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-2030
B-2030
03/16/1970
Application for Writ of Error
A. W. CULLUM AND COMPANY, INC.
ROBERT S. CALVERT, COMPTROLLER OF THE STATE OF TEXAS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/16/1970Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
04/10/1970Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filedRespondent
04/06/1970Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
03/20/1970Response to PetitionRespondent
03/16/1970Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/16/1970Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/10/1970Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed
04/06/1970Amicus Curiae Brief received
03/20/1970Response to Petition
03/16/1970Application for Writ of Error - FiledRefused
03/16/1970Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Andrews, Kurth, Campbell and JonesAmicus Curiae
A. W. Cullum and Company, Inc.Petitioner
Robert S. Calvert, Comptroller of the State of TexasRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information