Case: 05-93-01990-CV
05-93-01990-CV
12/28/1993
Other Personal Injury
Gaston, Floyd R., et al
The Lebaron Hotel, et al
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/24/2017 | Order entered | Destroy | | ||
06/06/2016 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||
11/14/1997 | Retention time case file will be retained | Destroy | | ||
10/25/1994 | Mandate Issued | | |||
10/25/1994 | Mandate Issued | | |||
08/25/1994 | Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Overruled | | ||
08/12/1994 | Response to Motion | | |||
08/02/1994 | Motion for Rehearing Filed | | |||
07/19/1994 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | | ||
07/19/1994 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | | ||
06/29/1994 | Submission | | |||
06/29/1994 | Submitted | | |||
06/29/1994 | Submission | | |||
06/29/1994 | Submitted | | |||
06/07/1994 | MattConv | | |||
04/20/1994 | Brief Filed | | |||
04/20/1994 | Case ready to be set | | |||
04/20/1994 | Case ready to be set | | |||
03/09/1994 | Letter Sent Regarding ADR Program | | |||
02/24/1994 | Brief Filed | | |||
02/01/1994 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
01/25/1994 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
12/28/1993 | Transcript Filed | | |||
12/28/1993 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |||
12/20/1993 | Statement of Facts Filed | | |||
11/09/1993 | Appeal Bond Filed | | |||
08/30/1993 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/24/2017 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
No Party. |
Trial Court Information
116th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Frank Andrews
91-6891-F