judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-81-00816-CR
14-81-00816-CR
06/16/1981
All Misdemeanors
Bayer, Abigail Green
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/23/1984Mandate Issued
02/23/1984Opinion issuedREVERSED
02/16/1984Submission
01/24/1984Case ready to be set
06/28/1983Case ready to be set
03/30/1982No description available.
03/29/1982AM CUR, OTHER,
11/24/1981Transcript FILED
06/16/1981Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/23/1984Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
Co Crim Ct at Law No 1
Harris
Honorable BILL RAGAN
619,018
30 days Prob.