Case: PD-0614-87
PD-0614-87
06/04/1987
PDR Case Type
XENAKIS, ALEXANDER ANTHONY
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
07/01/1987 | RESPONSE FILED | State | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
06/10/1988 | FINAL DISP | Refused | |
06/10/1988 | FINAL DISP | Refused | |
05/25/1988 | PDR DISP | Refused | |
05/25/1988 | PDR DISP | Refused | |
07/07/1987 | NO RESPONSE FILED | | |
07/01/1987 | RESPONSE FILED | | |
06/15/1987 | PDR FILED | | |
06/04/1987 | PDR FILED | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
06/20/1988 | STORED | RETURNED COA |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
STATE OF TEXAS | State | Jim Dozier |
XENAKIS, ALEXANDER ANTHONY | Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases) | Donald M. Brown |
Court of Appeals Information:
09-86-00051-CR
Rev & Rem 4-29-87
9th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 2
Montgomery
Honorable JERRY WINFREE
65,935