judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-2060
B-2060
03/26/1970
Application for Writ of Error
WESTERN UNION TELEGRAPH COMPANY
TARRANT COUNTY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/28/1970Brief in Support of PetitionAmicus Curiae
07/22/1970Brief in Support of PetitionAmicus Curiae
07/17/1970Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
07/14/1970Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
07/08/1970Motion for RehearingPetitioner
06/15/1970Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/20/1970Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/18/1970Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/15/1970Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/01/1970Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
04/27/1970Response to PetitionRespondent
04/02/1970Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
03/26/1970Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
08/11/1970Motion for Leave to file Motion for Rehearing
07/28/1970Brief in Support of Petition
07/22/1970Brief in Support of Petition
07/17/1970Amicus Curiae Brief received
07/14/1970Amicus Curiae Brief received
07/08/1970Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/15/1970Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/20/1970Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/18/1970Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/15/1970Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/01/1970Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/27/1970Response to Petition
04/03/1970Motion for Extension of Time to File ResponseFiling granted
04/02/1970Amicus Curiae Brief received
03/26/1970Application for Writ of Error - Filed
03/26/1970Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Southwestern Bell Telephone Company, Houston Natural Gas Company, and Southern Union Gas CompanyAmicus Curiae
TARRANT COUNTYRespondent
Texas Telephone Association and Southwestern Bell Telephone CompanyAmicus Curiae
Houston Lighting and Power Company and United Gas Distribution CompanyAmicus Curiae
D. H. Culton and B. M. BritainAmicus Curiae
Western Union Telegraph CompanyPetitioner
William Jarrell SmithAmicus Curiae
Frederick G. Von Huben and Bennett L. SmithAmicus Curiae
GULF STATES UTILITY COMPANYAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information