judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CRAY VS. CRAY

Case Information: 33390
Short Caption:CRAY VS. CRAYCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - DV9701226Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:12/04/1998 / Munnell, WilliamSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/24/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Woodburn & Wedge--check no. 51201.
11/24/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 98-00164
12/04/1998Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William Munnell. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
12/04/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 98-00264
12/09/1998Docketing StatementFiled Response to Docketing Statement. 98-00307
01/20/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 99-00397
01/29/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. Appellant shall have 15 days from this order to comply with the provisions of NRAP 9(a) and 120 days to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Threafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 99-00655
01/29/1999Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellants: 15 days to file a transcript /no transcript request; 120 days to file opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 99-00655
02/04/1999Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 99-00815
05/28/1999BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 5/28/99. 99-04466
05/28/1999AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 99-04467
06/30/1999BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Reno/Carson Msgr. 6/29/99. 99-05744
08/02/1999BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: hand delivered 08/02/99. 99-07058
09/27/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn1[Pursuant to NRAP 34(f), we conclude that oral argument is not warranted in this appeal]. NNP99B-RR/CY/ML 99-09213
10/06/1999Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. Letter from attorney Arnold Brock, Jr., requesting costs. 99-09606
10/12/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. Letter to attorney Arnold Brock. No action will be taken on his letter requesting costs. 99-09835
10/25/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 99-10397
10/25/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/03/1999RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 27, 1999. 99-10397