judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TERRY BRANNON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-1109
Short Caption:TERRY BRANNON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD8362-10Filed Date:09/01/2010

Opening Event Date:09/01/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:09/29/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/28/2011
Argued/Submitted:05/26/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/08/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantTerry Brannon Y
George E. RickmanYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/01/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/14/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that George Rickman, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. For the Court, Julio A. Castillo, Clerk (dfe)
09/14/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) George Rickman, Esquire
09/29/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (171pgs/Tape) 8/9/10 proc. w/CD included
09/29/2010RECORD COMPLETED
10/06/2010RECORD INDEX
10/06/2010RECORD COPIES
10/21/2010 On consideration of this court's order of September 14, 2010, directing counsel for appellant to file the statement regarding transcript within 30 days and it appearing that the statement regarding transcript has not been filed, it is ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall within 15 days from the date of this order submit the statement regarding transcript, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the document or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (Castillo)
11/03/2010MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE STATEMENT RE TRANSCRIPT no oppo
11/03/2010RECEIVED - aplt's statement regarding transcripts
11/19/2010ORD GR MOT FOR LV TO FILE STATEMENT RE TRANSCIPT and the lodged statement regarding transcript is filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (By: JAC)
11/19/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S)
12/28/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF
12/28/2010APPENDIX
12/28/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY - appeal pending the resolution of the motion
01/28/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
01/28/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
02/01/2011ORDER DENYING APPELLANT MOTION FOR STAY without prejudice to its renewal upon the filing of the D.C. Code 23-110 motion in the trial court. See Shepard v. United States, 553 A.2d 1278 (D.C. 1987). It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall advise this court, within 30 days from the date of this order, as to the steps taken to file the D.C. Code 23-110 motion in the trial court. (By: ETW)
03/15/2011ORDERED: That counsel for appellant shall advise this court, within 20 days from the date of this orer, as to the steps taken to file the D.C. Code 23-110 motion in the trial court. (By: ETW)
03/18/2011FINAL SCREENING - SUMMARY CALENDAR I
04/05/2011CALENDAR NOTICE SENT
05/17/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF no oppo (Brannon)
05/17/2011RECEIVED- aplt's reply brief
05/26/2011FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/26/2011ORDER GRANT APLT MOTION FOR LV TO FILE REPLY BRIEF and the lodged reply brief is filed. (JAC)
05/26/2011APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF
05/26/2011SUBMITTED before Judges Blackburne-Rigsby, Ruiz, Nebeker
05/26/2011SUBMITTED before Judges Blackburne-Rigsby, Ruiz, Nebeker
05/17/2012FiledAffirmed (OPINION) (Blackburne-Rigsby, Associate Judge, Ruiz*, Associate Judge, Retired, and Nebeker, Senior Judge.)
06/08/2012FiledMandate