judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-81-07135-CV
08-81-07135-CV
06/18/1981
Non-Adversary
F.D.P.C.
State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/24/1984Shuck purged
11/04/1981Mandate Issued
09/16/1981Opinion issuedDismissed
09/09/1981Judgment IssuedDismissed
09/09/1981Submission
09/09/1981Submitted
09/09/1981Case ready to be set
06/18/1981Transcript Filed
06/06/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/04/1981Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownAppellee
UnknownAppellant
Trial Court Information
327th District Court
El Paso
7555
n/a