judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

PURE Gen Holdings, Inc. v. NEORA, LLC

Case: 05-19-01548-CV
05-19-01548-CV
12/11/2019
Interlocutory
PURE Gen Holdings, Inc.
NEORA, LLC
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Document
11/10/2020Additional authorities filedAppellee
07/10/2020Reply brief filedAppellant
06/11/2020Additional authorities filedAppellee
05/22/2020Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
02/24/2020Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Document
02/25/2021Mandate issued
02/10/2021Sent to publisher
12/10/2020Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed
12/10/2020Retention time case file will be retainedDestroy
11/12/2020Submitted
11/10/2020Additional authorities filed
10/26/2020Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argument
10/23/2020Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argument
10/23/2020Appearance of counsel
09/08/2020Set for submission on oral argument
07/30/2020Corrected entry made by clerks office
07/20/2020Set for submission on briefs
07/13/2020Reply brief due
07/10/2020Reply brief filed
06/11/2020Additional authorities filed
06/03/2020Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/29/2020Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed
05/29/2020Notice filed
05/22/2020Case ready to be set
05/22/2020Brief filed - oral argument requested
05/22/2020Appellees brief due
05/15/2020Appellees brief due
05/12/2020Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
05/11/2020Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
04/15/2020Appellees brief due
04/14/2020Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
04/10/2020Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
03/15/2020Appellees brief due
03/12/2020Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
03/10/2020Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
02/26/2020Appellants brief due
02/24/2020Brief filed - oral argument requested
01/26/2020Appellants brief due
01/23/2020Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
01/21/2020Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
01/06/2020Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed
01/06/2020Reporters record due
12/27/2019Docketing statement filed
12/27/2019Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
12/23/2019Electronic Clerks Record Filed
12/21/2019Record due
12/20/2019Fee paid
12/20/2019Extension of time to file reporters record filed
12/18/2019Fee requested
12/18/2019Docketing statement due
12/18/2019Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
12/11/2019Notice of appeal filed in trial court
12/11/2019Case began in court of appeals
11/21/2019Judgment signed by trial court judge
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/25/2021Case StoredCase stored
12/10/2026RetentionDate civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
NEORA, LLCAppelleeMonica Wiseman Latin  
Parker L. Graham
Ken Carroll
Brent Michael Rubin
PURE Gen Holdings, Inc.AppellantMarc D. Katz  
Adam Pierson
Britney Prince
Cristina Torres  
Trial Court Information
160th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Aiesha Redmond
DC-19-10205
Gina M. Udall