judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Shannon McClary and Tina McClary v. Harvest Fuels, LLC

Case: 01-19-00980-CV
01-19-00980-CV
12/12/2019
Interlocutory
Shannon McClary and Tina McClary
Harvest Fuels, LLC
No
www.txcourts.gov/1stcoa
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Document
04/07/2020Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
03/18/2020Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Document
04/02/2021Mandate issued
01/29/2021Motion for rehearing was not filed
01/29/2021Motion for rehearing due
01/14/2021Memorandum opinion issuedAffirm TC judgment
01/14/2021Judgment Issued
01/13/2021Motion to substitute attorney disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/16/2020Submitted
08/10/2020Set for submission on briefs
04/27/2020Reply brief due
04/07/2020Case ready to be set
04/07/2020Brief filed - oral argument not requested
04/07/2020Appellees brief due
04/01/2020Appellants brief due
03/18/2020Brief filed - oral argument not requested
03/18/2020Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/18/2020Appellants brief due
03/13/2020Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
03/13/2020Supplemental clerks record filed
03/05/2020Response due
03/02/2020Letter filed
02/27/2020Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGrant motion to extend time; absent extraordinary circumstances, Court will not grant additional motions to extend time
02/26/2020Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
02/24/2020Notice of late brief
02/18/2020Appellants brief due
01/27/2020Reporters record filed
01/27/2020Reporters record due
01/24/2020Motion to substitute attorney filed
01/17/2020Extension of time to file reporters record disposedGrant motion to extend time; absent extraordinary circumstances, Court will not grant additional motions to extend time
01/17/2020Extension of time to file reporters record filed
01/16/2020Reporters record due
01/06/2020Extension of time to file reporters record disposedGrant motion in part and deny motion in part
01/06/2020Extension of time to file reporters record filed
01/02/2020Court reporters notice to court regarding status of recordRefused
01/02/2020Reporters record due
01/02/2020Court fee due
01/02/2020Docketing statement due
12/23/2019Clerks record filed
12/23/2019Record due
12/19/2019Docketing statement filed
12/18/2019Clerks notice to court regarding status of record
12/17/2019Extension of time to file reporters record disposedGrant motion in part and deny motion in part
12/17/2019Extension of time to file reporters record filed
12/16/2019Fee paid
12/12/2019Case began in court of appeals
12/12/2019Notice of appeal filed in trial court
12/12/2019Notice of appeal received
11/25/2019Judgment signed by trial court judge
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/02/2021Case StoredCase stored
04/02/2027RetentionDate civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Shannon McClary and Tina McClaryAppellantTory F. Taylor
Jennifer Chang
Harvest Fuels, LLC AppelleeAmy C. Falcon
Andrew Raber
Trial Court Information
344th District Court
Chambers
Honorable Judge 344th District Court
19-DCV-0367
Teri Daigle