judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-82-00501-CR
01-82-00501-CR
06/25/1981
Marijuana Possession
Eisenhauer, Lee Warren
Texas, The State of
No
Thomson/West
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/25/1988Mandate issued - criminal or civil
07/25/1988Mandate issued - criminal or civil
05/12/1988Stay issuance of mandate
05/12/1988Stay issuance of mandate
05/11/1988Motion for rehearing disposedDismissed
05/11/1988Motion for rehearing disposedDismissed
04/06/1988Motion for rehearing filed
04/06/1988Motion for rehearing filed
03/23/1988Higher court decisionCt App Rev & Jud Tr Ct Affirmd
03/23/1988Higher court decisionCt App Rev & Jud Tr Ct Affirmd
09/25/1985No description available.Grant motion
09/25/1985No description available.Grant motion
09/25/1985No description available.Grant motion
09/25/1985No description available.Grant motion
02/05/1985No description available.
02/05/1985No description available.
12/31/1984Opinion issuedReversed
12/31/1984Opinion issuedReversed
12/31/1984Opinion issuedReversed
11/27/1984Supplemental brief filed
11/27/1984Supplemental brief filed
11/07/1984Case file returned from higher Court or agency.
11/07/1984Case file returned from higher Court or agency.
11/02/1984Mandate issued - criminal or civil
11/02/1984Mandate issued - criminal or civil
10/17/1984Higher court decisionReversed & Remanded to Ct. App
10/17/1984Higher court decisionReversed & Remanded to Ct. App
09/13/1983No description available.
09/13/1983No description available.
08/11/1983Opinion issuedReversed and Dismissed
08/11/1983Opinion issuedReversed and Dismissed
08/11/1983Opinion issuedReversed and Dismissed
05/26/1983Submitted
05/26/1983Submitted
02/07/1983Supplemental brief filed
02/07/1983Supplemental brief filed
01/21/1983Brief filed
01/21/1983Brief filed
12/27/1982Brief filed
12/27/1982Brief filed
12/02/1982Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
12/02/1982Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
11/19/1982Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
11/19/1982Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
09/29/1982Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
09/29/1982Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
06/25/1982Notice of appeal filed
06/25/1982Notice of appeal filed
01/07/1982Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
01/07/1982Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/25/1988Case StoredCase stored
07/25/1988Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - AppellantScott Carpenter
StateCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes
StateCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes
StateCriminal - AppellantScott Carpenter
Trial Court Information
209th District Court
Harris
350,441
6 years $2,000.00 fine