Case: 09-21-00015-CR
09-21-00015-CR
01/19/2021
Attempted Burlary of a Habitation
Micah Lynn Richardson
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
04/21/2021 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
04/21/2021 | Brief filed - oral argument requested |
| |||||
04/09/2021 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
04/09/2021 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
03/09/2021 | Electronic Clerks Record Filed |
| |||||
02/03/2021 | Notice of appeal w/form from trial clerk |
| |||||
02/03/2021 | Exhibits filed |
| |||||
02/01/2021 | Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed |
| |||||
01/25/2021 | Appearance of counsel |
| |||||
01/22/2021 | Trial court certification filed | | |||||
01/19/2021 | Notice to trial court that certification is missing |
| |||||
01/19/2021 | Notice of appeal w/form from trial clerk | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
05/21/2021 | Status | State brief due |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Jennifer L. Bergman |
Richardson, Micah Lynn | Criminal - Appellant | James Matthew Gott |
Trial Court Information
75th District Court
Liberty
Honorable Mark Morefield
CR34223
Clifton Smith
6 yrs TDCJ-ID