judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

COLLIER (STEVEN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 33382
Short Caption:COLLIER (STEVEN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR941483Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Direct/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/20/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
11/20/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 98-00139
02/03/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Judgment: "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99A-CY/MS/ML 99-00728
03/02/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 99-01418
03/02/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/12/1999RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 9, 1999. 99-01418