judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STEVEN R. BURNETT v. ROSEANNE L. STEELEY, f/k/a ROSEANNE L. BURNETT

Case Heading (S-07-0225)
Parent:S-07-0225Case Docketed On:09/27/2007
Consolidated: S-08-0051
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Platte CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:STEVEN R. BURNETT v. ROSEANNE L. STEELEY, f/k/a ROSEANNE L. BURNETT
Full Title:STEVEN R. BURNETT, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. ROSEANNE L. STEELEY, f/k/a ROSEANNE L. BURNETT, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantSteven R. BurnettJared Scott Crecelius
AppelleeRoseanne L. SteeleyWilliam L. Hiser

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Marriage and Divorce, Other
Opinion Number:2008 WY 94
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/27/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/27/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/27/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
09/27/2007Order - Sanction - notice of appealOrderSanction - notice of appealFinal
09/27/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/03/2007Fees - Sanctions received - NOAFeesSanctions received - NOAFinal
11/08/2007Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
11/09/2007Notice-Incoming - Designation of record - appellantNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
12/21/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk and designation of record on appealBriefAppelleeFinal
12/21/2007Event - Phone Call to counsel for appellant; original brief not signed, requested replacement page 15 with signatureEventPhone CallFinal
12/26/2007Brief - Other - replacement page with original signatureBriefOtherFinal
01/07/2008Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
01/08/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/15/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, TranscriptRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/15/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
01/17/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
01/25/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgments - oral argument setting - Jared Crecelius for appellant; William Hiser for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/05/2008Notice-Internal - Recusal memo - Chief Justice Voigt.Notice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
02/05/2008Order - Assignment of judge - Judge John Perry for Chief Justice Voigt.OrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
02/27/2008Event - Phone Call - received call from clerk of district court indicating that she is preparing record for second appeal to come regarding attorney fees.EventPhone CallFinal
03/05/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before Justices Golden, Hill, Kite and Burke, and Perry, District Judge (Jared Scott Crecelius for appellant; William L. Hiser for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
03/05/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
05/20/2008Order - Consolidating casesOrderConsolidating casesFinal
08/14/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Kite writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
09/02/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/02/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
09/02/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/02/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/05/2008Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal