judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-1899
A-1899
09/10/1948
Application for Writ of Error
CITY OF CORSICANA
CHARLES WILLMANN, ET AL., CHARLES WILLMANN, ET AL. AND A. HAYES BONNER, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/27/1948Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filedRespondent
12/15/1948Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
12/01/1948Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
11/13/1948Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
09/20/1948Response to PetitionRespondent
09/20/1948Response to PetitionRespondent
09/10/1948Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/27/1948Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed
12/15/1948Amicus Curiae Brief received
12/01/1948Supplemental Brief filed
11/13/1948Supplemental Brief filed
10/20/1948Document received (See Remarks)
09/20/1948Response to Petition
09/20/1948Response to Petition
09/10/1948Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
09/10/1948Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Charles Willmann, et al.Respondent
City of CorsicanaPetitioner
Charles Willmann, et al. and A. Hayes Bonner, et al.Respondent
H. P. Kucera, City Attorney of Dallas, TexasAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information