judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-1906
A-1906
10/04/1948
Application for Writ of Error
CITY OF FORT WORTH
FIRE DEPARTMENT OF THE CITY OF FORT WORTH, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/22/1949Motion for RehearingPetitioner
11/11/1948Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
10/27/1948Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
10/14/1948Response to PetitionRespondent
10/12/1948Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
10/04/1948Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/28/1949Response to Motion filed
02/22/1949Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/03/1949Returned document(s). See Remarks.
11/11/1948Amicus Curiae Brief received
10/27/1948Amicus Curiae Brief received
10/27/1948Document received (See Remarks)
10/14/1948Response to Petition
10/12/1948Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
10/04/1948Document received (See Remarks)
10/04/1948Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Fire Department of the City of Fort Worth, et al.Respondent
Texas State Association of Fire FightersAmicus Curiae
City of Fort WorthPetitioner
James L. Lattimore and Joe J. AlsopAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information