Case Information: 52836 | |||
Short Caption: | GRAHAM VS. HENDERSON SADDLE ASSOC. | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A493822 Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A493834 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Saitta | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 12/04/2008 / Haberfeld, Stephen | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 12/30/2009 | How Submitted: | |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
11/26/2008 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Law Office of William R. brenske check no. 4863. | ||
11/26/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 08-30265 | |
12/04/2008 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Stephen E. Haberfeld | 08-30843 | |
12/08/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 3/19/07. To Court Reporter: Thelma Stapley, Kerry Esparza. | 08-31249 | |
12/08/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. Request for Transcript of Proceedings. | 08-31252 | |
12/15/2008 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Kerry Esparza stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 03/19/07. | 08-31791 | |
12/29/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 3/13/09 | 08-32814 | |
01/21/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. | 09-01647 | |
02/04/2009 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 09-03037 | |
02/05/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion. for Henderson Saddle Association, Inc. | 09-03242 | |
03/18/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 09-06913 | |
05/11/2009 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 45 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. We grant attorney Justin Pfrehm's motion to withdraw as counsel for respondent. The clerk shall remove the law firm of Georgeson Angaran from the docket of this appeal. Respondent remains represented by the law firm of Campbell Volk & Lauter. | 09-11624 | |
05/21/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Justice Disqualification. Justice Saitta disqualified. (Attorney Brenske represents her in an unrelated matter.) | 09-12605 | |
06/23/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. Appellants shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Respondent may file any reply within ten days from the date that appellants' response is served. Briefing is suspended. | 09-15556 | |
07/01/2009 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. | 09-16231 | |
07/29/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Allowing Appeal to Proceed and Reinstating Briefing Schedule. Opening Brief and Appendix due: 45 days. | 09-18478 | |
09/10/2009 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 09-21929 | |
09/10/2009 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vols. 1 through 4. | 09-21931 | |
10/02/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice of Change of Firm Name and E-Mail Address | 09-24158 | |
10/06/2009 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 09-24418 | |
11/04/2009 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 09-27012 | |
12/30/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Oral argument will not be scheduled in this appeal, and it shall stand submitted on the record and the briefs filed herein, as of the date of this order. | 09-31529 | |
12/30/2009 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
01/11/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP10-JH/MD/KP | 10-00843 | |
01/27/2010 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Petition for Rehearing. | 10-02299 | |
01/27/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Filing Fee on Rehearing. Due date: 10 days. | 10-02300 | |
02/08/2010 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $150 from Law Office of William R. Brenske. Check No. 5320. | ||
03/10/2010 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. "We deny appellants' petition for rehearing." NRAP 40(c). | 10-06198 | |
04/05/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-06767 | |
04/05/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
04/13/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 8, 2010. | 10-06767 |