Case: 19-1057
19-1057
12/02/2019
Petition for Review originally filed as 53.7(f)
LENNON II FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP
GREGORY GIDEO, SOUTHERN UNDERGROUND, LLC, AGL CONSTRUCTORS JOINT VENTURE, ARCHER WESTERN CONTRACTORS, LLC, GRANITE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, AND THE LANE CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
12/31/2019 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | Petition for Review filed on behalf of Lennon II Family Limited Partnerhsip. |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/13/2020 | Notice sent to Court of Appeals | |
| |||||
02/07/2020 | Petition for Review disposed | Denied | |
| ||||
01/07/2020 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |||||
01/02/2020 | Response Waiver filed | Response Waiver filed on behalf of Gregory Gideo, et al. | ||||||
01/02/2020 | Response Waiver filed | Response Waiver filed on behalf of AGL Constructors- Joint Venture, et al. | ||||||
12/31/2019 | Petition for Review | Petition for Review filed on behalf of Lennon II Family Limited Partnerhsip. |
| |||||
12/02/2019 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposed | Filing granted | Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review granted. Petition for Review due January 6, 2020. |
| ||||
12/02/2019 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed | Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Lennon II Family Limited Partnership. |
| |||||
12/02/2019 | Clerk's Record | | | |||||
12/02/2019 | Clerk's Record | | | |||||
12/02/2019 | Court reporter/recorder's record | | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
03/13/2020 | Case Stored | Case stored. | e-stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The Lane Construction Corporation | Respondent | Mr. Howard Jay Klatsky Mr. Scott William Self |
Archer Western Contractors, LLC | Respondent | Mr. Scott William Self Mr. Howard Jay Klatsky |
Granite Construction Company | Respondent | Mr. Scott William Self Mr. Howard Jay Klatsky |
Gideo, Gregory | Respondent | Mr. Bobby M. Rubarts |
Lennon II Family Limited Partnerhsip | Petitioner | Ms. Cynthia C. Hollingsworth Mr. H. Grady Chandler Ms. Grace Ann Weatherly |
Southern Underground, LLC | Respondent | Mr. Bobby M. Rubarts |
AGL Constructors Joint Venture | Respondent | Mr. Howard Jay Klatsky Mr. Scott William Self |
Court of Appeals Information:
02-18-00250-CV
Affirmed
___ SW3d ___, 08-29-19
2nd Court of Appeals
Honorable Dabney Dorsett Bassel
Trial Court Information
442nd District Court
Denton
Honorable Tiffany L. Haertling
15-09569-442