Case: 02-89-00054-CR
02-89-00054-CR
03/07/1989
Robbery
Briggs, Samuel Charles
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
08/06/1990 | Mandate Issued | | |
06/20/1990 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
03/07/1990 | Submitted | | |
03/07/1990 | Submission | | |
11/29/1989 | Brief Filed | | |
11/16/1989 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
11/15/1989 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed | | |
10/31/1989 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
10/30/1989 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed | | |
10/04/1989 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
10/04/1989 | Submission | | |
10/04/1989 | Brief Filed | | |
10/02/1989 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed | | |
09/21/1989 | Letter | | |
08/17/1989 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
08/17/1989 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed | | |
07/13/1989 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
07/13/1989 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed | | |
06/16/1989 | Criminal record or relator's record and/or exhibits | | |
03/07/1989 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
03/07/1989 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
08/06/1990 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
No Party. |
Trial Court Information
213th District Court
Tarrant
Honorable R. E. Thornton
0357926R
20 yrs., TDC