judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CASEY VS. CHRISTIE

Case Information: 33381
Short Caption:CASEY VS. CHRISTIECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Churchill Co. - Tenth Judicial District - 24456Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:12/04/1998 / Munnell, WilliamSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:06/13/2000 at 11:00 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:06/13/2000How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/20/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Robison, Belaustegui, Robb & Sharp--check no. 0045365.
11/20/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 98-00137
11/20/1998Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. 8/5/98 and 8/6/98. To Court Reporter: Lola Sharp. 98-00138
12/04/1998Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William Munnell. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
12/07/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 98-00269
01/25/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter (mailed on: 01/21/99). 99-00501
02/12/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. Nevertheless, the briefing and request for transcripts shall remain suspended pending a jurisdictional review and further order of this court. 99-01009
02/23/1999Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. Court reporter Lola Sharp shall have 30 days from the date of this order to comply with the provisions of NRAP 9(b). Appellants shall have 100 days from the date of this order to file the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 99-01229
06/01/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 99-04536
06/02/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 99-04558
06/04/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Extending Time. Court reporter Sharp shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file the requested transcripts or show cause why this court should not impose sanctions upon her. Appellants shall, within 60 days from the date of this order, serve and file the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 99-04672
06/11/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. 08/05/98, vol. 1 and 08/06/98, vols. 2 and 3. Proceedings: Court Reporter: Lola L. Sharp. 99-04983
08/03/1999BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 8/3/99. 99-07092
08/03/1999AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Volumes 1 through 3. 99-07093
09/10/1999MotionFiled Stipulation. 99-08557
09/10/1999MotionFiled Stipulation. Stipulation Re: Original Exhibits. 99-08558
10/06/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Motion Granted in Part. The parties have filed a stipulation to extend the time for filing the answering brief and a stipulation that this court direct the district court to transmit the original exhibits filed below. We elect to treat the parties' stipulation as a joint motion, and we deny the motion to transmit exhibits. Respondent shall, on or before October 12, 1999, serve and file the answering brief. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). At that time, the parties may submit a supplemental joint appendix, or respondent may submit a respondent's appendix. Should any of the exhibits be incapable of reproduction and inclusion in an appendix, the parties may again move for the transmittal of specific exhibits to be transmitted. 99-09576
10/12/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time (Second Request). 99-09883
10/14/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. The answering brief shall be served and filed on or before November 12, 1999. 99-09971
11/12/1999BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 11/12/99 (Reno Carson). 99-11190
12/08/1999BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: hand delivered 12/08/99 (Reno Carson). 99-12285
04/21/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for June 13, 2000 at the hour of 11:00 a.m. for 1/2 hour in Carson City.(NNP99B-CY/DA/ML) 00-06494
05/26/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. 00-08874
06/13/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Before the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP99B-CY/DA/ML
09/08/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Remand. " . . . we reverse the district court's judgment and remand this case for a new trial before the disrict court." In view of the foregoing, we need not decide the merits of the other issues raised on appeal. NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-15844
10/04/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-16034
10/04/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/25/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 5, 2000. 00-16034