judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TONY HATTO and BEN SULLIVAN, individually and TONY HATTO and BEN SULLIVAN d/b/a DESIGN WORKSHOP, a partnership v. RICHARD MEYER and MIRACLES MEYER

Case Heading (S-07-0224)
Case Number:S-07-0224Case Docketed On:09/24/2007
Linked To: S-07-0223
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Contract
Short Title:TONY HATTO and BEN SULLIVAN, individually and TONY HATTO and BEN SULLIVAN d/b/a DESIGN WORKSHOP, a partnership v. RICHARD MEYER and MIRACLES MEYER
Full Title:TONY HATTO and BEN SULLIVAN, individually and TONY HATTO and BEN SULLIVAN d/b/a DESIGN WORKSHOP, a partnership, Appellants (Defendants), v. RICHARD MEYER and MIRACLES MEYER, Appellees (Plaintiffs)

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantTony HattoMark Diehl Sullivan
AppellantBen SullivanMark Diehl Sullivan
AppellantDesign Workshop, a partnershipMark Diehl Sullivan
AppelleeP. Richard MeyerRobert N. Williams
Pamela Treste Parkins
AppelleeMiracles MeyerRobert N. Williams
Pamela Treste Parkins

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2008 WY 153
Citation:198 P.3d 552

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/24/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/24/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/24/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
09/24/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/07/2007Brief - Appellant; and statement of costs; and received copy of brief on disk.BriefAppellantFinal
12/17/2007Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
12/26/2007Brief - Appellees; received copy of designation of recordBriefAppelleeFinal
01/04/2008Brief - Appellants replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
01/11/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/17/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
01/25/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgments - oral argument setting - Robert Williams for appellants Meyer; Mark Sullivan for appellees Hatto, et al.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
01/31/2008Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
01/31/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal, two volumes, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/31/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
03/05/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Robert N. Williams for appellants Meyer; Mark Diehl Sullivan for appellees Hatto and Sullivan) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
03/05/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
12/23/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing in partOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
01/08/2009Notice-Internal - Other - no motion for attorney fees and costs filed within 15 days per W.R.A.P. 10.06.Notice-InternalOtherFinal
01/08/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
01/08/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
01/08/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
01/08/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/09/2009Event - Phone Call from counsel for the appellees; the parties have completely settled the case. He wanted court to know why he did not file a motion for attorney fees and costsEventPhone CallFinal
01/14/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 1/12/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal