judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JOSEPH C. TYSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-1091
Short Caption:JOSEPH C. TYSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Misd. Sex Abuse
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DVM1832-09Filed Date:08/17/2010

Opening Event Date:08/17/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:10/22/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/28/2012
Argued/Submitted:01/23/2013
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/21/2013
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJoseph C. Tyson Y
David H. StringerYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Uma M. AmuluruYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/17/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/14/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that James W. Klein, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. For the Court, Julio A. Castillo, Clerk (dfe)
09/20/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
10/22/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (287pgs/Hunt) 5/3-5/10 proc.
10/22/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (23pgs/Tape) 5/17/10 proc.
10/22/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (22pgs/Tape) 6/15/10 proc.
10/22/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (31pgs/Tape) 7/20/10 proc.
10/22/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (44pgs/Tape) 7/22/10 proc. w/CD
10/22/2010RECORD COMPLETED
10/26/2010RECORD INDEX
10/26/2010RECORD COPIES
10/27/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
12/07/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 90 days (no oppo)
12/20/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before March 7, 2011. (By: JAC)
03/07/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 90 days (no oppo)
03/16/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before June 6, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (By: JAC)
06/06/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 90 days (no oppo)
06/21/2011ORD GRANT APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before September 6, 2011. No fruther requests for extensions of time will be granted absent a showing of good cause. (By: ETW)
08/11/2011FiledSupplemental Record - #6 (14pgs/Tape) 5/3/10 proc. w/CD
09/06/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief - until December 5, 2011 (no oppo) (Appellant)Denied as Moot
09/20/2011FiledCounsel's Motion To Withdraw (Appellant)Granted
10/12/2011FiledOrder Granting appellant's motion to withdraw as counsel and denying asd moot appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the breif and directing briefing
10/12/2011FiledAppointing Counsel/CJA David Stringer, Esquire (Appellant)
10/12/2011FiledBriefing Order
01/11/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
01/26/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix on or before March 30, 2012
04/04/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
04/25/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix on or before May 30, 2012
06/05/2012FiledOrdered that counsel for appellant shall within 20 days from the date of this order file the brief and limited appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time
06/25/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
08/14/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix to the exent that the brief and limited appendix shall be filed within 15 days from the date of this order
08/28/2012FiledBrief (Appellant)
08/28/2012FiledAppendix (attached to brief) (Appellant)
09/28/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)
09/28/2012FiledBriefing Completed
11/08/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary
12/03/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
01/23/2013FiledSubmitted to Judges Washington, Fisher, Pryor
05/29/2013FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, Fisher, Associate Judge, and Pryor, Senior Judge.)
06/21/2013FiledMandate