judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ZHANG VS. RECONTRUST CO. C/W 52326

Case Information: 52835
Short Caption:ZHANG VS. RECONTRUST CO. C/W 52326Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated: 52326 *, 52835Related Case(s): 43601 , 52326 , 58602 , 69246 , 70923
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A481513Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:12/10/2009 at 11:30 AMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:12/10/2009How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/26/2008Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
11/26/2008Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/No Settlement. Notice of exemption from settlement conference program mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 08-30239
11/26/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days 08-30243
11/26/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days 08-30244
12/08/2008Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Marquis & Aurbach - check no. 092759.
12/08/2008Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. 08-31250
12/08/2008Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. Notice of No Transcripts to be Requested. 08-31251
12/08/2008Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 08-31254
12/15/2008MotionFiled Motion to Consolidate. Nos. 52326/52835. 08-31737
12/22/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Consolidating Appeals. Pursuant to our October 30, 2008, order in Docket No. 52326, upon completion of briefing, these consolidated matters will be expedited to the extent that this court's docket permits. Nos. 52326/52835 (08-32470).
12/29/2008MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: January 8, 2009. Nos. 52326/52835 (08-32823).
01/12/2009MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Granted: 33 pages. Nos. 52326/52835 (09-00900)
01/12/2009BriefFiled Opening Brief. Nos. 52326/52835 (09-00905)
01/13/2009Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Change of Firm Name. Harrison, Kemp, Jones & Coulthard, LLP, is now known as Kemp, Jones & Courthard, LLP. Nos. 52326/52835 [09-00957]
02/09/2009MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: February 18, 2009. Nos. 52326/52835 (09-03469).
02/20/2009BriefFiled Answering Brief. Nos. 52326/52835 (09-04513).
03/24/2009MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: March 30, 2009. Nos. 52326/52835 (09-07425).
04/01/2009BriefFiled Reply Brief. Nos. 52326/52835 (09-08206).
10/21/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Before the Northern Nevada Panel. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on December 10, 2009 at 11:30 a.m. Nos. 52326/52835. NNP09-MC/NS/MG 09-25740
11/25/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. Nos. 52835/52326. 09-28789
12/10/2009Case Status Update Oral Argument Held this Day. Case Submitted for Decision.. Supplemental briefing order. Nos. 52326/52835
01/12/2010BriefFiled Supplemental Brief. Appellant's Supplemental Brief Requested by Court at Oral Argument Hearing. Nos. 52326/52835 (10-00888).
01/12/2010BriefFiled Supplemental Brief. Respondents' Supplemental Brief. Nos. 52326/52835 (10-00892).
01/12/2010Notice/IncomingFiled Errata. Errata to Respondents' Supplemental Brief. Nos. 52326/52835 (10-00969).
02/26/2010Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." NNP10-MC/NS/MG. Nos. 52326/52835. 10-05149
03/16/2010MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Respondent's Joint Motion to Extend Time. Nos. 52326/52835. 10-06980
03/17/2010Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. Nos. 52326/52835 (10-07077).
03/17/2010Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. E-Payment $150 from Micah S. Echols. Nos. 52326/52835.
03/22/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Directing Answer to Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. Respondent's Answer due: 15 days. Nos. 52326/52835 (10-07451).
03/23/2010Post-Judgment PetitionReceived Petition for Rehearing. (FILED PER ORDER 03/29/10). Respondent's Petition for Rehearing. Nos. 52326/52835. (via E-Flex).
03/29/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion. The clerk is directed to file the parties' respective rehearing petitions submitted via e-flex. Nos. 52326/52835 (10-08054).
03/29/2010Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. Repondents' Petition for Rehearing. Nos. 52326/52835 (10-08055).
03/29/2010Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. E-Payment $150 from Matthew S. Carter. Nos. 52325/52835.
04/09/2010Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Nos. 52326/52835.
05/18/2010Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). Nos. 52326/52835 (10-12954).
05/27/2010Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Respondent's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Nos. 52326/52835. 10-13845
05/28/2010Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Appellant's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Nos. 52326/52835.
09/21/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answers to Petitions for En Banc Reconsideration. Appellant and Respondents: Each have 15 days to file their answer. Nos. 52326/52835. 10-24308
10/07/2010Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Answer to Appellant's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Nos. 52326/52835. 10-26097
10/07/2010Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Answer to Respondent's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Nos. 52326/52835. 10-26120
11/17/2010Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration and Modifying Prior Order. "Having considered the petitions and answers filed herein, we conclude that en banc reconsideration is not warranted, and we deny it." We modify footnote 3, on page 3, and replace the last sentence to clarify our conclusion as follows: "We therefore remand this matter to the district court to determine whether attorney fees and costs are appropriate in light of this order." Hardesty, J., dissenting. Nos. 52326/52835. 10-30078
12/13/2010RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Nos. 52326/52835 10-32434
12/13/2010Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. Nos. 52326/52835
12/28/2010RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on December 21, 2010. Nos. 52326/52835 10-32434